Governing document THE ROYAL NATIONAL COLLEGE FOR THE BLIND

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD APRIL 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 JUNE 1993, AMENDED 15 OCTOBER 1998 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8 DECEMBER 2009 REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PEOPLE WHO ARE BLIND OR VISUALLY IMPAIRED AND FOR SUCH OTHER PEOPLE AS THE GOVERNORS MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME ("BENEFICIARIES").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.