THE ROYAL NATIONAL COLLEGE FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 1000388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN RYAN Trustee 09 February 2016 None on record
Simon Hairsnape Trustee 13 October 2017
THE CLD TRUST Received: On time
Victoria-Marie Pugh Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Peter Flynn Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
KERRY ANN DIAMOND Trustee 13 October 2017
ST PETER'S COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION TRUST (DORMINGTON) Received: On time
JONATHAN BREW Trustee 01 July 2015
HARRISON CLARK RICKERBYS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, BROADWAS, WORCESTERSHIRE Received: On time
Elliot Kyle Bastable Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Suzanne Penny Trustee 13 July 2018
HEREFORDSHIRE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS SUPPORT SERVICE Received: On time
JEREMY CLARKE-MORRIS Trustee 30 September 2016
WORCESTERSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION LIMITED Received: On time
LUCY PROCTOR Trustee 31 December 2017 None on record