THE ALEXANDER CHARITY OF STOW-ON-THE-WOLD

Charity number: 1000441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.35k £23 £971 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A