THE INSTITUTE FOR LAW ACCOUNTABILITY AND PEACE

Charity number: 1000444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 28 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 22 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 02 August 2016 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required