Accounts and annual returns THE ZEBRA FOUNDATION FOR VETERINARY ZOOLOGICAL EDUCATION

Charity number: 1000452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 11 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 13 March 2020 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 04 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required