Financial history THE ZEBRA FOUNDATION FOR VETERINARY ZOOLOGICAL EDUCATION

Charity number: 1000452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £5.21k £14.17k £11.84k £3.47k £8.98k
Total expenditure £8.52k £4.87k £16.11k £10.47k £11.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A