THE ARAB WELFARE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1000465
Charity reporting is overdue by 1730 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 269 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 269 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 635 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 635 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1000 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1000 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1365 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1365 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1730 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1730 days