THE ARAB WELFARE AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1000465
Charity reporting is overdue by 1722 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £0 £0 £12.01k £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £6.40k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A