GAINFORD PARISH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes in the Parish of Gainford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Durham
Governance
- 02 October 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES WOOD | Chair | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sally Ann Roscoe | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Outhwaite | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Brown | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Joan Mccreanor | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY SILLARS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE LAVENDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.12k | £2.48k | £2.31k | £2.32k | £625 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.11k | £80 | £0 | £4.87k | £1.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
FOR ANY GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTION IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF GAINFORD
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GAINFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 High Green
Gainford
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL2 3DL
- Phone:
- 01325732039
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window