THE DEXTER CATTLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1000520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 April 2018 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 January 2018 92 days late Download