THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FIREFIGHTERS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of public education in fire safety matters and , in furtherance thereof, to award burseries or prizes for people involved with or associated with firefighting , rescue of safety. To establish or support a museum , to accept gift or artifacts related to fire safety. To support other charities and charitable purposes as the Trustees shall decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 October 1990: Standard registration
- 30 March 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 30 March 2021: Funds transferred to 1182241 THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FIREFIGHTERS CHARITABLE ...
- FIREFIGHTERS (Previous name)
- FIREFIGHTERS COMPANY (Previous name)
- GUILD OF FIREFIGHTERS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE COMPANY OF FIREFIGHTERS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FIREFIGHTERS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.13k | £82.27k | £95.15k | £76.68k | £60.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.62k | £76.80k | £64.25k | £53.78k | £56.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | COVID filing extension granted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | COVID filing extension granted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 25 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 25 June 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 25 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | 25 June 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH JULY 1990 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1990 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 23RD OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN FIRE SAFETY MATTERS AND IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF TOAWARD SCHOLARSHIPS OR BURSARIES OR PRIZES FOR PEOPLE INVOLVED WITH OR ASSOCIATED WITH FIREFIGHTING RESCUE OR FIRE SAFETY WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES WOULD BENEFIT FROM THE SCHOLARSHIP B) TO ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT A MUSEUM AND/OR ACCEPT GIFTS OR LOANS OF EQUIPMENT AND ARTEFACTS C) TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window