THE PREHISTORIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1000567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £79.22k £80.88k £80.88k £72.67k £82.58k
Total expenditure £73.25k £73.58k £73.58k £79.47k £93.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A