THE PREHISTORIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1000567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Daniela Hofmann Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
Dr Benjamin William Roberts Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
James Nathan Cole Trustee 21 October 2020
CHARTERS-ANCASTER COLLEGE (1995) Received: On time
Dr Susanna Mary Harris Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
DR CLARE ELIZABETH RANDALL Trustee 27 July 2011 None on record
Professor Joanna Mary Bruck Trustee 27 July 2018 None on record
Dr Courtney Reiko Nimura Trustee 20 October 2013 None on record
Dr Melanie Giles Trustee 27 July 2018 None on record
DR MIKE ALLEN Trustee
THE CONCHOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND Received: On time
Dr Linda Mary Hurcombe Trustee 21 October 2020 None on record
Peter Clark Trustee 26 July 2018 None on record
Dr Richard Antony Brunning Trustee 15 June 2019 None on record
DR JULIE PATRICIA GARDINER Trustee None on record
Professor Clive Stephen Gamble Trustee 26 July 2018 None on record
DR Sophia Adams Trustee 26 July 2018 None on record
Annabel Zander Trustee 17 August 2017 None on record
Dr Rachel Joanne Crellin Trustee 15 June 2019 None on record
Dr Helen Louise Chittock Trustee 15 June 2019 None on record
Professor Jacqueline Mulville Trustee 15 June 2019 None on record
Dr Anne Mary Teather Trustee 15 June 2019 None on record
DR Jodie Lewis Trustee 10 August 2018 None on record
DR Matthew Giuseppe Knight Trustee 17 August 2017 None on record