Trustees WILTSHIRE AND BATH INDEPENDENT LIVING TRUST LTD
Charity number: 1000659

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gina Sargeant | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Trethewey | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Truelove | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|||||
ALAN VEASEY | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Eric John Clifford | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANEY HILLIER | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HURN | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
|||||
LIZ JEGGO | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
TONY CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr NIGEL HARRIS PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JEREMY BRADBROOKE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.