BRENTWOOD CATHOLIC CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 1000661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 21 November 2016 On time Download