Financial history BRENTWOOD CATHOLIC CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 1000661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £870.22k £1.50m £1.06m £894.57k £881.26k
Total expenditure £885.80k £837.32k £871.06k £935.82k £782.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £16.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £244.52k £888.09k £433.39k £215.68k £319.40k
Income - Other trading activities £123.72k £115.49k £110.58k £127.80k £46.60k
Income - Charitable activities £494.01k £485.17k £508.84k £542.70k £507.46k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.97k £8.40k £9.05k £8.40k £7.80k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £15.00k £455.36k £220.74k £2.78k £9.75k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £780.78k £743.10k £757.37k £797.32k £690.16k
Expenditure - Raising funds £105.01k £94.22k £113.69k £138.49k £92.64k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £22.17k £22.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0