FRIENDS OF NORTHLANDS WOOD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1000765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £14.30k £16.45k £22.59k £15.50k £8.53k
Total expenditure £10.11k £5.15k £28.08k £14.62k £8.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A