BROOKE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was formed to assist and promote the Corby City Technology College Trust (now Brooke Weston Academy) and for the advancement of education generally. The charity holds land only which it has made available to the Academy by granting a lease.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 09 November 1990: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINA ISABELLA GUINNESS DE CAPELL BROOKE | Chair | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Edward Guinness de Capell Brooke | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE ASSISTANCE AND PROMOTION OF CORBY CITY TECHNOLOGY COLLEGE AND OTHER GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CORBY NORTHANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREAT OAKLEY HALL
GREAT OAKLEY
CORBY
NN18 8HN
- Phone:
- 01536741577
- Email:
- Kathryn.Walshaw@azets.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window