Financial history AMANAT CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 1000851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £34.81m £35.36m £34.64m £46.50m £54.63m
Total expenditure £31.40m £32.82m £36.92m £48.15m £50.99m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £33.41m £34.12m £33.33m £45.23m £53.32m
Income - Other trading activities £1.27m £1.06m £1.18m £894.44k £1.14m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £128.63k £180.26k £130.70k £103.11k £22.93k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £268.87k £145.55k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £30.88m £32.34m £36.48m £47.76m £50.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £516.23k £474.70k £445.44k £390.92k £687.16k
Expenditure - Governance £35.96k £53.21k £121.06k £142.88k £64.71k
Expenditure - Grants institution £17.33m £19.17m £19.32m £36.12m £28.22m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0