Trustees BOLTON CATHOLIC MUSICAL AND CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 1000865

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Crompton-Hill | Chair | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Paul Cunliffe | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clarice Shannon Greenhalgh | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Libby Hill | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Harvey | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Shinks | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER LOUISE PEARCE | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ursula Dawn Maria Greenhalgh | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE GRADY | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Wilkinson | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ANNE GRADY | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEANETTE MARGARET WINSTANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.