PLATFFORM FOR CHANGE

Charity number: 1000889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.70m £7.34m £8.65m £8.61m £10.64m
Total expenditure £6.75m £7.40m £8.93m £8.95m £9.07m
Income from government contracts £4.62m £4.98m £6.77m £5.32m £5.68m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.91k £28.19k £75.47k £74.97k £1.40m
Income - Other trading activities £567.40k £708.28k £1.37m £1.62m £1.53m
Income - Charitable activities £6.11m £6.59m £7.20m £6.89m £7.70m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.96k £14.72k £6.39k £7.46k £5.78k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £11.24k £6.76k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £20.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.21m £6.62m £7.39m £7.23m £7.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.20k £12.14k £2.15k £1.78k £2.97k
Expenditure - Governance £22.82k £10.39k £8.23k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £534.17k £799.93k £1.53m £1.72m £1.12m