PLATFFORM FOR CHANGE

Charity number: 1000889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne-Louise Tonge Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
Naomi Louise Lea Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
Cher Lewney Trustee 23 September 2020 None on record
Nasir Adam Trustee 22 September 2021 None on record
Stephen Brian Spill Trustee 06 November 2019 None on record
Deborah Green Chair 13 December 2013 None on record
Christopher Jamie Dowson Loughran Trustee 02 September 2015 None on record
DAVID JOHN DAVIES Trustee 02 September 2014 None on record
Ubongabasi Edidiong Obot Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record
Neil Mark Hapgood Trustee 11 March 2020 None on record
Stewart John Davison Trustee 13 December 2013 None on record
Huw David Davies Trustee 11 March 2020 None on record