Accounts and annual returns EMMAUS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1000918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 12 October 2020 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 01 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 01 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 24 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 24 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window