Financial history EMMAUS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1000918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £35.57k £61.31k £21.17k £20.97k £24.76k
Total expenditure £22.11k £22.81k £22.19k £21.54k £19.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A