Dogfen lywodraethu WEARSIDE WOMEN IN NEED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH OCTOBER 1983 AS AMENDED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1984, 24TH JUNE 1987, 25TH JUNE 1988, 21ST APRIL 1989, 28TH JULY 1989, 31ST JULY 1990 AND 27TH JULY 1993.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO SUPPORT WOMEN IN NEED BY PROVIDING TEMPORARY RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR WOMEN IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO HAVE BEEN CONSTRAINED TO LEAVE THEIR HOMES AS A RESULT OF ACTUAL OR APPREHENDED INJURY TO THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH, OR THEIR CHILDREN'S HEALTH BY REASON OF THE CONDUCT OF THEIR COHABITEES, SUCH FACILITIES BEING EXTENDED WHERE NECESSARY TO INCLUDE THE CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Maes buddion
WASHINGTON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.