BARTS RADIO

Charity number: 1000953
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £77 £6.83k £4.08k £3.08k £10
Total expenditure £1.37k £13.67k £2.38k £216 £3.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A