ALDEBURGH MUSIC CLUB

Charity number: 1000990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 27 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 06 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 06 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 13 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 13 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 18 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 09 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 09 February 2017 On time Download