BEANFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1001086
Charity reporting is overdue by 1701 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 240 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 April 2020 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 606 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 October 2019 270 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 971 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 September 2018 238 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1336 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 September 2018 603 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1701 days