BEANFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1001086
Charity reporting is overdue by 1694 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £46.03k £45.57k £48.56k £53.51k £48.33k
Total expenditure £50.69k £52.06k £54.96k £52.67k £51.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £416 N/A
Income from government grants £11.66k £11.66k £11.66k £11.66k £11.66k