U R C LINK

Charity number: 1001089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £1.22k £1.59k £3.39k £4.31k £3.09k
Total expenditure £1.21k £1.67k £2.32k £4.34k £3.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A