Accounts and annual returns OAK WOOD SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1001100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 September 2020 07 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2019 18 August 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2018 08 January 2020 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2017 16 November 2018 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 15 September 2016 27 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 September 2016 Not Required