ST KEVERNE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1001158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 April 2021 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 March 2019 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required