ST KEVERNE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1001158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.93k £4.74k £9.21k £5.02k £2.50k
Total expenditure £14.46k £5.40k £8.04k £4.33k £1.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A