Financial history ST MARY'S CHURCH IMPROVEMENT FUND

Charity number: 1001187
Charity reporting is overdue by 1579 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £374 £106 £61 £61 £60
Total expenditure £65.25k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A