STAFFORDSHIRE NORTH AND STOKE-ON-TRENT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX

Charity number: 1001204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.58m £2.97m £3.26m £3.30m £3.73m
Total expenditure £2.66m £2.94m £3.26m £3.31m £3.50m
Income from government contracts £1.49m £1.18m £1.13m £1.17m £1.37m
Income from government grants £423.39k £818.39k £1.14m £361.01k £1.81m
Income - Donations and legacies £362.81k £313.03k £379.00k £146.95k £105.46k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £17.78k £18.23k £19.47k £7.32k
Income - Charitable activities £2.22m £2.64m £2.86m £3.13m £3.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.15k £338 £12 £194 £9
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.63m £2.90m £3.22m £3.26m £3.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £34.32k £45.60k £48.50k £48.64k £51.78k
Expenditure - Governance £40.66k £8.61k £8.71k £10.23k £9.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0