THE ANASTASIA FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is for general charitable purposes, education and training, medical, health and sickness relief and to help with disabilities. The Charity helps children and young people, elderly and old people, those with disabilities or special needs and other charities and voluntary bodies by making grants to individuals (including loans) and by making grants to organisations including schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bournemouth
- Surrey
- Sutton
- Burundi
- Rwanda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 12 December 1990: Standard registration
- 12 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £923 | £932 | £482 | £4.67k | £121 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.05k | £1.05k | £400 | £2.34k | £5.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 08 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 22 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 11 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 AUGUST 1990
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS IN SUCH PROPORTION AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window