BELFREY ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1001265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.93k £8.76k £8.61k £8.46k £8.46k
Total expenditure £5.72k £5.56k £8.44k £13.66k £13.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A