THE FRIENDS OF BINGHAM PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 1001283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 March 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 23 October 2020 261 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 28 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 26 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required