THE WATERSIDE CENTRE, KINGS LANGLEY

Charity number: 1001330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £287.11k £298.30k £323.46k £310.62k £291.61k
Total expenditure £286.53k £315.25k £321.80k £317.56k £271.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A