THE WATERSIDE CENTRE, KINGS LANGLEY

Charity number: 1001330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tracy Anne Moloney Trustee 14 January 2019 None on record
Robert George Finlay Mclean Chair 11 May 2015 None on record
ANTHONY DONOVAN Trustee 24 January 2014 None on record
HELEN LOUISE FLETCHER Trustee 28 June 2021 None on record
JOHN HOWARD BIGGS Trustee 26 November 2012 None on record
SHARON MICHELE ABBOTT Trustee 28 June 2021 None on record
SANDRA KIDD Trustee 07 March 2016 None on record
IAN TERENCE PASSEY Trustee None on record