Financial history THE WELSH WATER ELAN TRUST

Charity number: 1001347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.29m £1.61m £1.85m £1.95m £2.22m
Total expenditure £853.57k £1.14m £1.35m £1.50m £1.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £128.43k £755.84k £944.08k £718.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £3 £20.00k £114.09k
Income - Other trading activities £6.84k £0 £15.84k £10.97k £5.86k
Income - Charitable activities £1.29m £1.59m £1.83m £1.92m £2.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £443 £580 £1.58k £40 £3.41k
Income - Other £101 £21.68k £1.56k £125 £130
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £853.57k £1.14m £1.35m £1.50m £1.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £29.10k £36.53k £38.50k £44.71k £48.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.63k £3.35k £5.95k £2.65k £2.80k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0