ST PAUL'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1001566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 September 2016 On time Download