ST PAUL'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1001566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £377.93k £374.00k £379.18k £415.87k £344.96k
Total expenditure £366.07k £377.58k £388.56k £418.55k £310.44k
Income from government contracts £58.59k £143.45k £127.02k £137.13k £120.16k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £1.05k £4.93k