Accounts and annual returns NORTH BEDFORDSHIRE HOSPICE CARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1001614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 21 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 22 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 13 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 06 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 06 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window