Trustees NORTH BEDFORDSHIRE HOSPICE CARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1001614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr THOMAS GREVILLE INSKIP Chair 09 July 2019
THE BEDFORD AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
Michael Paul Walker Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Peter Quarmby Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
Margaret Ibbett Trustee 09 July 2020
BEDFORDSHIRE CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Judy Christine Greevy Trustee 09 July 2020
None on record
Debra May Smith Trustee 29 August 2019
None on record
DONALD COLIN STUART PARSONS Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record
Dr Vijay Krishnan Nayar Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Lynne Quarmby Trustee 10 January 2017
None on record
Ian Charles Codrington Trustee 10 December 1991
None on record