Trustees EMH CARE AND SUPPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1001704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Woolley Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Simon Ketteridge Trustee 16 September 2022
None on record
Roger Merchant Trustee 16 September 2022
DERBY MUSEUMS
Received: On time
Amanda Ashton Trustee 07 September 2021
None on record
MARGARET COWARD Trustee 14 September 2018
THE UNITED CHARITIES OF ABEL COLLIN
Received: On time
Patricia McCabe Trustee 15 September 2017
BIRMINGHAM AND SOLIHULL WOMEN'S AID
Received: On time