WELSH BORDER COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity number: 1001760
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JULY 1990 AS AMENDED 10 DECEMBER 1990 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FACILITIES IN COUNTY OF FLINTSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE USE OF CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER COMMUNITY GROUPS FOR CARRYING OUT CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE THEY ARE DISABLED, SICK, OR ELDERLY, OR LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS WHERE THERE ARE NO ADEQUATE PUBLIC TRANSPORT FACILITIES.
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 31 January 1991 : registered
  • 18 May 2018 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (INCOR))
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services