FUTURE HOPE (UK )
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objectives of Future Hope remain directed towards helping underprivileged children worldwide and in partiular the relief of poverty distress and suffering; provision of shelter; care; food and clothing, medical supplies and basic treatment; and the provision of education and training to help the children develop into self supporting adults. Future Hope raises awareness of issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- India
Governance
- 01 February 1991: Standard registration
- 04 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1157547 FUTURE HOPE (U.K.)
- FUTURE HOPE (UK) (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.60k | £342.45k | £272.86k | £310.44k | £364.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.20k | £181.53k | £147.55k | £256.34k | £308.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 25 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 25 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 28 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 28 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 30 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 30 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 JANUARY 1991
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SUFFERING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD INCLUDING (A)THE PROVISION OF SHELTER CARE FOOD CLOTHING AND MEDICAL SUPPLIES AND TREATMENT. (B)THE PROVISION AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING. (C)THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO MEDICAL NUTRITIONAL HUMANITARIAN AGRICULTURAL AND OTHER MATTERS RELATING TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SUFFERING.
Area of benefit
ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window