Trustees THE HALO TRUST

Charity number: 1001813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lord Jonathan Douglas Evans KCB DL Chair 01 November 2023
SKINNERS' CHARITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Caroline Philippa Wicks Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
John Alexander Deans Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Lucia Veronica Halpern Trustee 15 March 2022
WORLDREADER
Received: On time
Lieutenant General Sir Barnabas William Benjamin White-Spunner KCB CBE Trustee 16 May 2021
THE HOUSEHOLD CAVALRY MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Emma Sky OBE Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Jose Pedro Agostinho Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
John Raine CMG OBE Trustee 01 January 2019
THE GERRY HOLDSWORTH SPECIAL FORCES CHARITY
Recently registered
TAIGH MOR FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE GERRY HOLDSWORTH SPECIAL FORCES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Anastasia Staten Trustee 22 May 2018
None on record
Mark Jonathan Aedy Trustee 27 February 2018
None on record
Anthony Patrick Mycroft Beeley Trustee 10 June 2016
None on record
Col Jane Davis OBE QVRM Trustee 10 December 2013
None on record