FRIENDS OF HORIM ESTABLISHMENTS TEL AVIV AND ARAD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to institutions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
Governance
- 11 February 1991: Standard registration
- 16 January 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FRIENDS OF HORIM ESTABLISHMENTS TEL AVIV AND ARAD LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.65k | £2 | £1 | £1.08k | £147.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £381.18k | £678 | £320 | £356 | £140.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 12 June 2017 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 12 June 2017 | 132 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 12 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH. NOVEMBER 1985, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14TH. FEBRUARY 1986.
Charitable objects
(1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH.(2)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.(3)SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW AS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE TEL AVIV AND ARAD,ISRAEL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window